Masters v Samich
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James L Graham |
Referred: | Chelsey M Vascura |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03697 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 6:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jeffrey Samich
|
|
Plaintiff
Sirus Masters
737 McAllister Avenue
Columbus, OH 43205 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Mon 08/19 9:53 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Jeffrey Samich against Sirus Masters. Case Terminated. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Mon 08/19 9:47 AM
OPINION AND ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re4 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 8/19/24. (ds)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 08/02 2:34 PM
NOTICE: Refiling of Lawsuit, by Plaintiff Sirus Masters. (vb )(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Wed 07/17 2:03 PM
This entry is for statistical purposes only. See ECF No.4 for document. (mas) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 07/17 1:57 PM
ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re3 Complaint filed by Sirus Masters. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a) (ECF No. 1) is GRANTED and Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. 2) is DENIED. It is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint under § 1915(e)(2) for failure to assert any claim over which this Court has subject-matter jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 7/31/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/17/2024. (mas) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 1:47 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Jeffrey Samich, filed by Sirus Masters. (mas) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 07/15 10:53 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by Plaintiff Sirus Masters. (vb) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/15 10:46 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Sirus Masters. Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form, #4 USM Form). (vb) |