Huff v. Evolve Bank & Trust
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | Mark S Norris |
Referred: | Annie T Christoff |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02495 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:17 AM CDT |
Defendant
Evolve Bank & Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randell Huff
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 08/26 4:49 PM
[**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING22 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING A RULING FORM THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ON PENDING MOTION FOR TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Defendant has moved to stay this matter pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") on a motion to transfer and centralize this action, along with several dozen other actions, into a multidistrict litigation before a single federal court for all pretrial proceedings ("MDL transfer motion"). The motion states that the JPML will hear the MDL transfer motion on September 26, 2024. Plaintiff does not oppose the requested stay. The Courts finds the motion well-taken, and it is hereby GRANTED . This matter is hereby STAYED pending resolution of the MDL transfer motion. The parties are ORDERED to file a notice of the JPML's decision within 10 days after that decision is issued. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 8/26/2024. (Norris, Mark) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Stay
Fri 08/23 5:14 PM
MOTION to Stay (Proposed Order Submitted) by Evolve Bank & Trust.(Schrack, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Consultation | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/20 7:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amisha R Patel on behalf of Evolve Bank & Trust (Patel, Amisha) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Sun 08/04 9:44 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 08/04/2024. (msn) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/31 10:20 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Randell Huff.(Goldenberg, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing (District Court) | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 07/31 11:27 AM
[**TEXT ORDER ONLY -- NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING18 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. For good cause shown, and acknowledging that it is unopposed, Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall have up to and including October 7, 2024 in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 7/31/24. (Norris, Mark) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 07/30 1:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Proposed Order Submitted) by Evolve Bank & Trust. (Schrack, Andrew) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/30 1:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evolve Bank & Trust identifying Corporate Parent Evolve Bancorp, inc. for Evolve Bank & Trust.. (Schrack, Andrew) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/30 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B Schrack on behalf of Evolve Bank & Trust (Schrack, Andrew) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/30 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Van Horn on behalf of Evolve Bank & Trust (Van Horn, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 4:27 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 07242024. (msn) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Deficiency Notice
Wed 07/24 2:03 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Fee paid as part of previous filing) filed by Randell Huff has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: The filer not being the applicant.. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (mlk) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 1:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Randell Huff.(Schaffer, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing of PA, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing of IL | ||
11 | 11
notice
Deficiency Notice
Wed 07/24 1:13 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number BTNWDC-4465739) filed by Randell Huff has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: You are missing a certificate and the applicant is not the filer. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (mlk) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 11:44 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number BTNWDC-4465739) by Randell Huff.(Schaffer, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
notice
Deficiency Notice
Wed 07/24 9:50 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4465577) filed by Randell Huff has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Only one certificate is attached. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and |
|
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 9:39 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4465577) by Randell Huff.(Goldenberg, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/17 3:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randell Huff as to Evolve Bank & Trust. (Honeycutt, Alexandra) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/12 4:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Evolve Bank & Trust. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mf) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/12 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mf) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice LR 16.2
Fri 07/12 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mf) |
|
3 | 3
notice
ADR Compliance
Fri 07/12 3:55 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mf) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 07/12 3:54 PM
Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (mf) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 12:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Evolve Bank & Trust (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4456621), filed by Randell Huff.(Honeycutt, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |