Thomas v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-md-02846
Lead case: 2:18-md-02846
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edmund A Sargus |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03700 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 6:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bard Davol, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C.R. Bard, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/13 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Lawrence Alexander for Defendants Bard Davol, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Alexander, Eric) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/01 11:45 AM
Short Form ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bard Davol, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Kloss, William) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10063794), filed by Mark Thomas. (Amill Cintron, Manuel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |