Gilberti, P.E. v. Rubio et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Aileen M Cannon |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80850 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 12, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
Acknowledgment of Receipt from USCA
Thu 08/29 1:15 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E.. Date received by USCA: 08/23/2024. USCA Case Number: 24-12717 G. (jgo) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Clerk's Notice (Other) with Optional Ad Hoc NEF
Fri 08/23 1:03 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Mailing Pro Se Instructions to Joseph D. Gilbert re15 Notice of Appeal. (apz) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Vacate
Fri 08/23 12:57 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's Objection14 to Order of Dismissal12 . Plaintiff's appeal of that Order remains pending15 . This case remains closed. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon 8/23/2024. (jco) |
|
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Fri 08/23 12:35 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re15 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz) |
||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 08/23 12:35 PM
Notice of Appeal re12 Order Dismissing/Closing Case, by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E. Filing Fee: NOT PAID. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form[LINK:www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] . (apz) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Hearing Miscellaneous Relief Vacate
Fri 08/23 12:33 PM
Plaintiff's Objection to DE12 Order of Dismissal and to Reinstate Case Based on US Constitution to Protect US Citizens Health and National Defense. MOTION for Hearing and Motion to Vacate12 Order Dismissing/Closing Case, by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E. (apz) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Compliance
Tue 08/13 9:44 AM
Clerk's Notice of Compliance re12 Order Dismissing/Closing Case, (Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff) (pc) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Tue 08/13 9:37 AM
ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS; DISMISSING CASE; AND DENYING MOTIONS AS MOOT Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Motions terminated:11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E.,10 MOTION to take Judicial Notice /Evidence Hearing re1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus, MOTION for Hearing filed by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E.,5 MOTION to add Respondent re1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus, filed by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E.,9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E.. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 08/09 12:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E.. (pc) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief Hearing
Fri 08/09 12:44 PM
Petitioner's Request for Court to take Judicial Notice/Evidence Hearing re1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus, by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E.. (pc) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 08/05 2:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E.. (pc) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/05 2:23 PM
Notice of Filing Response to Clerk for IFP and Cover Sheet by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E. re 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. (pc) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Compliance
Fri 07/26 4:37 PM
CLERK NOTICE of Compliance re6 Order of Instructions to Plaintiff to Pay Filing Fee or File a Motion to Proceed IFP. Copy of this Order along with the Application to Proceed IFP(Short Form) mailed out to Plaintiff at Sarasota County Jail. (kma) |
|
6 | 6
5
pgs
order
Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant
Fri 07/26 4:27 PM
ORDER INSTRUCTING PLAINTIFF TO PAY THE FILING FEE OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Failure to pay the filing fee or to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis will result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 7/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (kma) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/22 2:31 PM
MOTION to add Respondent "Council of National Defense" re1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus, by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E.. (pc) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/22 1:13 PM
Request to Clerk of Court for In Forma Pauperis and Civil Cover Forms by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E. (mailed documents requested) (pc) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Fri 07/12 3:31 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ebz) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 07/12 3:30 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. (ebz) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus
Fri 07/12 3:27 PM
Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus against Joe Biden, City of West Palm Beach Council, Department of Homeland Security, Byron Donalds, Kamala Harris, Palm Beach County Board of County Commissioners, Marco Rubio, South Florida Water Management District, Southwest Florida Management District, St. John's Water Management District. Filing fee $ 405.00, Not Paid, Due. Filed by Joseph D. Gilberti, P.E..(ebz) Modified text on 7/12/2024 (ebz) |