Sparks v. Legends P P S et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | David C Joseph |
Referred: | David J Ayo |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00935 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 15th Judicial District Court Parish of Lafayette, 20243447-I |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 3:42 AM CDT |
Defendant
Apache Corp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ecoserve L L C
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Legends P P S
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Odyssea Marine L L C
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
R C I Consultants Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Safety Management Systems L L C
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Sparks
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Ecoserve
Terminated: 07/22/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Corrective Document
Fri 08/23 9:31 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safety Management Systems L L C identifying Corporate Parent Acadian Ambulance Service Inc, for Safety Management Systems L L C. (aty,LeBlanc, Beau) Modified text on 8/23/2024 (Thomas, T) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Corrective Document
Fri 08/23 9:25 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Safety Management Systems L L C. (aty,LeBlanc, Beau) Modified text on 8/23/2024 (Thomas, T) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Fri 08/23 8:53 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Beau Anthony LeBlanc on behalf of Safety Management Systems L L C regarding18 Corporate Disclosure Statement,17 Answer to Amended Complaint. Reason: The document is not on letter-size paper as required by LR10.1. Please re-submit this document in proper form. (crt,Thomas, T) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/22 10:41 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safety Management Systems L L C identifying Corporate Parent Acadian Ambulance Service Inc, Corporate Parent Safety Management Systems L L C for Safety Management Systems L L C. (aty,LeBlanc, Beau) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 08/22 10:37 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Safety Management Systems L L C.(aty,LeBlanc, Beau) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/06 2:52 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R C I Consultants Inc. (aty,Johnson, Edward) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 08/06 2:51 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by R C I Consultants Inc.(aty,Johnson, Edward) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/05 3:17 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Odyssea Marine L L C identifying Corporate Parent Odyssea Intermediate, LLC, Corporate Parent Odyssea Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Highwood Partners, L.P. for Odyssea Marine L L C. (aty,Skinner, Stephanie) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 08/05 3:14 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Odyssea Marine L L C.(aty,Skinner, Stephanie) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/01 11:54 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Legends P P S. (aty,Gaudin, Andre') |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 08/01 11:48 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Legends P P S.(aty,Gaudin, Andre') |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Response to Removal Order
Mon 07/29 2:37 PM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Apache Corp .(aty,Tompkins, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" State Court Pleadings | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/29 2:35 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apache Corp identifying Corporate Parent APA Corporation for Apache Corp. (aty,Tompkins, Peter) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 07/29 2:33 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Apache Corp.(aty,Tompkins, Peter) |
|
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Mon 07/29 2:52 PM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Apache Corp answer due 8/5/2024; Ecoserve L L C answer due 8/5/2024; Legends P P S answer due 8/5/2024; Odyssea Marine L L C answer due 8/5/2024; R C I Consultants Inc answer due 8/5/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY - NO PDF ATTACHED, see10 RESPONSE to Removal Order, attachment #1. (crt,Bunting, M) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/22 10:51 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ecoserve L L C, identifying Corporate Parent Eco Parent L L C, Ecoserve L L C. (aty,Perry, Steven) Modified to correct filer and edit docket text on 7/22/2024 (Thomas, T) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 07/22 10:46 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, and Original Complaint by Ecoserv, LLC by Ecoserve.(aty,Perry, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Removal Order
Tue 07/16 10:54 AM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 7/16/2024. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Mon 07/15 1:44 PM
ISSUED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Peter B Tompkins on behalf of Apache Corp; and Kevin R Duck on behalf of Christopher Sparks. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 7/29/2024. (crt,Thomas, T) Modified to indicate document issued in error on 7/15/2024 (Thomas, T) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Mon 07/15 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Peter B Tompkins on behalf of Apache Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/29/2024. (crt,Thomas, T) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 07/15 1:40 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/15/2024. (crt,Thomas, T) |
|
notice
Notice of Corrective Action
Mon 07/15 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Peter B Tompkins on behalf of Apache Corp regarding4 Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement. Action taken: Modified to indicate notice issued in error. (crt,Thomas, T) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/12 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Parish of Lafayette, Case Number C-20243447-I with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5997068) filed by Apache Corporation.(Attorney Peter B Tompkins added to party Apache Corporation(pty:dft))(aty,Tompkins, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 16 pgs State court petition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B List of Attorneys, | ||
Att: 3 Civil cover sheet | ||
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/15 1:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apache Corp, Ecoserve, Legends P P S, Odyssea Marine L L C, R C I Consultants Inc, Safety Management Systems L L C with Jury Demand filed by Christopher Sparks. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #1 of document1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Thomas, T) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/15 1:36 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Thomas, T) |