NEPTUNE v. CAREY et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Shipp |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-07739 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 6:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
ANDREW CAREY
|
|
Defendant
MIDDLESEX COUNTY
|
|
Defendant
MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE
|
|
Defendant
MIDDLESEX COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE
|
|
Plaintiff
LOUIS NEPTUNE
14 WILLIAM ST
EAST ORANGE, NJ 07018 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Saturday, August 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/26 10:58 AM
PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by LOUIS NEPTUNE (kht) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/22 2:04 PM
MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Change of Venue by LOUIS NEPTUNE. (kht) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Mon 08/19 3:12 PM
Letter from LOUIS NEPTUNE regarding change of venue. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (amv) |
|
11 | 11
respoth
Brief
Mon 08/19 3:07 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Claim of Immunity by LOUIS NEPTUNE. (mlh) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Change Venue
Fri 08/02 10:30 AM
MOTION to Change Venue by LOUIS NEPTUNE. (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(jdg) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 07/26 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by LOUIS NEPTUNE. (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(jal, ) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 07/24 4:09 PM
Mail1 ,2 Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to LOUIS NEPTUNE. (amv) |
|
Sunday, July 21, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Recusal
Mon 07/22 1:50 PM
MOTION for Recusal of Judge Michael Shipp by LOUIS NEPTUNE. (mlh) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Change Venue
Mon 07/22 1:44 PM
MOTION for Change of Venue by LOUIS NEPTUNE. (mlh) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application to Proceed IFP
Fri 07/19 9:46 AM
APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by LOUIS NEPTUNE. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (amv) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/17 3:55 PM
Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by LOUIS NEPTUNE (kht) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter: Filing Fee or IFP due
Fri 07/12 3:29 PM
Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (kht) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers
Fri 07/12 3:28 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (kht) |
|
1 | 1
service
Complaint Received
Fri 07/12 3:27 PM
Complaint Received. (kht) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |