Brabham Family Enterprises, Inc. dba Reds Rollen Garage v. Riser Logistics LLC
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03701 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Gallia County Common Pleas, 24CV39 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 6:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
Riser Logistics LLC
182 S Waters Edge Drive Apt. 301
Glendale Heights, IL 60139 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brabham Family Enterprises, Inc.
14727 State Route 554
Bidwell, OH 45614 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 08/23 3:55 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Riser Logistics LLC NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS (Nordstrom, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 08/06 4:14 PM
ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/6/24. (sem) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
Mon 08/05 4:23 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 8/28/2024. Joinder of Parties/Motions to Amend due by 10/25/2024. Discovery due by 1/10/2025. (If the parties are unable to reach an agreement on any matter related to discovery, they are directed to arrange a conference with the Court). Dispositive motions due by 4/11/2025. Primary Expert due by 2/7/2025. Rebuttal Expert due by 3/7/2025. Settlement Demand due by 2/14/2025. Response to Settlement Demand due by 3/14/2025. Mediation Deadline: 3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/5/2024. (vb) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/02 1:46 PM
NOTICE: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2024 11:30 AM is VACATED. (See ECF No.8 .) (sln) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 08/01 3:29 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Riser Logistics LLC. (Harlow, Jessica) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/25 4:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Brabham Family Enterprises, Inc.. (Porotsky, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/16 1:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Riser Logistics LLC, Riser Logistics LLC identifying Corporate Parent Riser Logistics LLC for Riser Logistics LLC.. (Nordstrom, Jennifer) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/16 1:02 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint filed by Riser Logistics LLC. (Nordstrom, Jennifer) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/16 1:00 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Riser Logistics LLC (Civil Cover Sheet) (Nordstrom, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 07/15 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2024 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Riser Logistics LLC, filed by Brabham Family Enterprises, Inc. dba Reds Rollen Garage. (jlk) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/12 5:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Gallia County Common Pleas, case number 24CV39 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10064422), filed by Riser Logistics LLC. (Nordstrom, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Complaint |