Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. v. Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Myron H Thompson |
Referred: | Jerusha T Adams |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00416 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 5:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation
a non-profit corporation c/o Robert C. Black, Registered Agent 30 South Perry Street
Montgomery, AL 36104 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/07/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/29 2:12 PM
NOTICE by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation Concerning Assignment to Magistrate Judge (Smith, John) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
18
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/25 1:14 PM
Pretrial Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/25/2024. (Originally Filed: 12/15/2022 in case 2:20-cv-00300-MHT-JTA) (LAB) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/25 1:13 PM
ORDER: The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to docket the pretrial order from the original case (Doc. 168 2:20cv300 MHT)) in this severed case. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/25/2024. (LAB) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/25 1:11 PM
ORDERED: that the docket sheet in this case shall reflect that a jury demand has been made by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/25/2024. (LAB) |
|
7 | 7
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 07/25 11:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson: Status Conference held on 7/25/2024 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Katie Sears-Silas, 334-315-0363, katie_searssilas@almd.uscourts.gov.) (MLF) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 07/17 2:46 PM
ORDER: granting 5 Unopposed Motion to Reschedule the July 18, 2024 Status Conference. The status conference currently set for July 18, 2024, at 9:00 a.m., is reset for July 25, 2024, at 9:00 a.m., by Zoom. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/17/2024. (LAB) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Status
Wed 07/17 1:28 PM
MOTION for Status Unopposed Motion to Reschedule the July 18, 2024 Status Conference by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (Smith, John) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
order
~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 07/15 9:33 AM
Docketed in Error. Modified on 7/15/2024 (LAB) |
||
order
~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 07/15 9:34 AM
TEXT ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/18/2024 at 09:00 AM via ZOOM before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Entered by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/15/2024. (LAB) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 07/12 4:44 PM
2:20-cv-00300-MHT-JTA Docket sheet. (LAB) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/12 4:43 PM
ANSWER to 2 Complaint, by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (Originally Filed: 09/29/2021 in case 2:20-cv-00300-MHT-JTA) (LAB) |
|
2 | 2
61
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation, filed by Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. (Originally Filed: 09/15/2021 in case 2:20-cv-00300-MHT-JTA) (LAB) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
1 | 1
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/12 4:35 PM
ORDER ON JCS COUNTERCLAIM: The count of the counterclaim pertaining to the JCS matter (Count IV of the second amended counterclaim) shall be severed from the other counts contained in the counterclaim and treated in all further proceedings as if it had been filed by defendant Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. as a separate action. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to file the severed case as a separate action. So that the court may continue taking up the parties' arguments on a staggered basis, Munich is not to file a new motion for summary judgment in this severed case until the court directs it to do so. An order scheduling briefing will follow. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/12/2024. (See Order for Further Details) (LAB) |