Rice v. Maricopa, County of et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Roslyn O Silver |
Referred: | Michael T Morrissey |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01723 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 08/30 4:24 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jason Rice. Reason for return: return to sender, no longer in custody. Document number5 and6 . (EJA) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 08/27 3:33 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Reason for return: return to sender, no longer in custody. Document number6 . (EJA) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Tue 08/20 11:33 AM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Jason Rice. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 8/20/24. (EJA) |
|
5 | 5
19
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 08/20 11:32 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc.2 ) is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $5.10. The Complaint (Doc.1 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 8/20/24. (EJA) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment
Fri 07/12 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (EJA) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Fri 07/12 3:52 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jason Rice. (1 page) (EJA) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/12 3:51 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Rice. (3 pages) (EJA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 3:49 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Jason Rice. (10 pages and envelope)(EJA) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |