Dean v. RIX Industries
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Carla Baldwin |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00307 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | District Court Washoe County, Nevada, cv24-00745 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 3:01 AM PDT |
Defendant
RIX Industries
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dean
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
5
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/27 9:27 AM
ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall file a joint case management report by no later than Friday, October 11, 2024 . IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/27/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HL) |
|
8 | 8
order
Standing Order
Tue 08/27 9:21 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER - MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARLA BALDWIN. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HL) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Reply
Fri 08/23 1:43 PM
REPLY to Response to5 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant RIX Industries. (Molleck, Luke) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response
Fri 08/16 12:09 PM
RESPONSE to5 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Robert Dean. Replies due by 8/23/2024. (Roven, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Motion Dismiss
Fri 08/02 3:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant RIX Industries. Responses due by 8/16/2024. (Branson, Z.) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
order
Standing Order
Tue 07/16 12:10 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 07/12 4:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by RIX Industries. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Karyn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition Removal
Fri 07/12 4:25 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Washoe County, Nevada, Case Number CV24-00745, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7744472) by RIX Industries. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/22/2024. (Molleck, Luke) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Index, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Notice to State, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Summons and other Document, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Notice to Plaintiff | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 07/16 10:18 AM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DLS) |
||
notice
ENE Notice
Tue 07/16 10:19 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney will be the evaluating judge in this case. No ENE will be conducted in cases subject to arbitration. Parties to cases subject to mandatory arbitration, as well as parties who agree to arbitrate, must notify the Court of the same no later than 14 days after the date of this Notice. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (no image attached) (DLS) |