Horn v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allison Claire |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01917 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 2:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eddie Ray Horn
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Wed 09/11 3:05 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Camagong, Joan) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/11 2:57 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Camagong, Joan) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Tue 07/30 5:20 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint - To Extend Time to Respond by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Camagong, Joan R. added. (Camagong, Joan) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider
Fri 07/12 5:06 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Fri 07/12 5:05 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert B. Mobasseri* *Law Offices of Robert B. Mobasseri, Apc* *15760 Ventura Blvd. Suite 850* *Encino, CA 91436*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 1:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. by Eddie Ray Horn. Attorney Mobasseri, Robert B. added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11630914) #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Mobasseri, Robert) |