Jimenez v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Raag Singhal |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-22657 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Attorney General
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warden of Detention Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexis Jimenez
A-Number: 024722495 Krome Service Processing Center Inmate Mail/Parcels 18201 SW 12th Street
Miami, FL 33194 |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 08/30 2:54 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Dismiss. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Thu 08/15 12:36 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Responses due by 8/29/2024.(Romero, Kelsi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Order of Supervision | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/26 10:49 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $ 5.00. USM Service NOT Ordered . Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 07/18 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelsi R. Romero on behalf of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Attorney Kelsi R. Romero added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft). (Romero, Kelsi) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 07/18 7:09 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Show Cause Response due by 8/29/2024. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant
Thu 07/18 6:53 AM
ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/12 1:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexis Jimenez. (kma) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Fri 07/12 1:52 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal (kma) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 07/12 1:46 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00 (IFP Motion filed), filed by Alexis Jimenez. Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (kma) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit DHS records |