Asrorov v. Mayorkas et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Natasha C Merle |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-04872 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 5:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Acting Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou
In her official capacity as Director USCIS Acting Director of USCIS 5900 Capital Gateway Drive, Mail Stop 2120,
Camp Springs, MD 20588 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Safet Marke
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Laura B. Zuchowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheroz Asrorov
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 08/09 6:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheroz Asrorov. Safet Marke served on 7/19/2024, answer due 9/17/2024. (Hutton, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 08/09 6:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheroz Asrorov. Laura B. Zuchowski served on 7/19/2024, answer due 9/17/2024. (Hutton, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 08/09 6:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheroz Asrorov. Alejandro Mayorkas served on 7/19/2024, answer due 9/17/2024. (Hutton, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 08/09 6:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheroz Asrorov. Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 7/19/2024, answer due 9/17/2024. (Hutton, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases
Thu 07/18 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Zito on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Zito, Nicole) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 07/16 9:24 AM
Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Safet Marke, Alejandro Mayorkas, Laura B. Zuchowski, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JP) |
|
order
Order to Show Cause (Federal)
Tue 07/16 2:58 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and Electronic Service upon the US Attorneys' Office re1 Complaint -- Upon the complaint for writ of mandamus filed July 12, 2024, it is ORDERED that: (1) The United States Attorney, as attorney for defendants, is directed to show cause on or before September 16, 2024, in writing, why a writ of mandamus should not be issued, and shall serve a copy of the response on plaintiff, with proof of such service to the Clerk of this Court; (2) On or before October 17, 2024, plaintiff shall file their reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of this Court; (3) Service of a copy of this Order, together with a copy of the complaint, shall be made by the Clerk of this Court via electronic case filing to the United States Attorney. Ordered by Judge Natasha C. Merle on 7/16/2024. (PWK) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 07/15 9:58 AM
Proposed Summons. by Sheroz Asrorov (Hutton, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Updated Attached Rider | ||
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 07/15 8:30 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/15 8:25 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Natasha C. Merle. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) |
||
misc
Quality Control Check - Summons
Mon 07/15 8:39 AM
|
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 6:57 PM
COMPLAINT FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND OTHER INJUNCTIVE RELIEF: PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR ADJUSTMENT OF STATUS TO LAWFUL PERMANENT RESIDENT BASED ON APPROVED VAWA FORM I-360 against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18066529 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Sheroz Asrorov. (Hutton, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Documents In Support of Complaint |