Cottle v. Crosby et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William M Ray, II |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00171 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 18:241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 6:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Breck K Burgess
|
|
Defendant
Chi Memorial Hospital
|
|
Defendant
Tyler Crosby
|
|
Defendant
Jon A Cunningham
|
|
Defendant
Bridget A. Graham
|
|
Defendant
Debra Luectefeld
|
|
Defendant
Himani Marathe
|
|
Defendant
Sean Mayer
|
|
Defendant
Jeff Ochs
|
|
Defendant
Peachford Hospital
|
|
Defendant
Rameshial Rawlani
|
|
Defendant
Andrea Robbins
|
|
Defendant
Elizabeth Walker Swann
|
|
Defendant
Kathryn Thurmann
|
|
Plaintiff
Bryan K Cottle, Sr.
P O Box 3815
St. Louis, MO 63136 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Permanent Injunction
Tue 08/20 4:03 PM
MOTION for Injunction with Address Change by Bryan K Cottle, Sr.. (dob) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Forms Sent ~Util - Directing Payment of the Filing Fee
Wed 08/14 1:10 PM
ORDER - This matter is before the Court on plaintiff pro se Bryan K Cottle, Sr.'s Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs1 (IFP Application). The information provided in the IFP Application, however, is insufficient for the Court to judge plaintiffs status as a pauper. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS plaintiff to submit a completed form application to proceed IFP and affidavit of indigence, or submit the full filing fee of $405.00 on or before September 6, 2024. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail plaintiff the appropriate financial affidavit and application, together with a copy of this Order. (Forms sent to party: Affidavit to Proceed IFP;). Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 8/14/24. c:Financial Office(klb) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 08/14 1:11 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bryan K Cottle, Sr. re2 Order and forms sent. (klb) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/12 8:13 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (dob) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/12 8:12 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bryan K Cottle, Sr..(dob) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |