Terrell #249642 v. Gettings et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Jonker |
Referred: | Sally J Berens |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00711 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:20 AM EDT |
defendant
Heather S. Bergmann
|
|
defendant
Jeffrey S. Gettings
|
|
defendant
Karen M. Hayter
|
|
plaintiff
Robert Edward Terrell #249642, Jr.
Harrison (MSP) Gus Harrison Correctional Facility 2727 E Beecher St.
Adrian, MI 49221 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order to Proceed IFP - Prisoner
Tue 07/16 9:11 AM
ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial appeal fee of $27.86 within 28 days; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln) Modified text on 7/16/2024 (jln) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 07/16 2:19 PM
Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Prisoner,4 sent via U.S. Mail to Robert Edward Terrell #249642, Jr. (eod) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Receipt of Case Notice
Fri 07/12 9:11 AM
NOTICE of receipt of case (eod) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 07/12 1:15 PM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Robert Edward Terrell #249642 (pjw) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees
Fri 07/12 9:03 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (eod) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Documents | ||
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 8:54 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Heather S. Bergmann, Jeffrey S. Gettings, Karen M. Hayter filed by Robert Edward Terrell #249642, Jr (eod) |