Sapp v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Sherri A Lydon |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-03920 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 6:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Anthony Prewitt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Myra Sapp
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 09/05 1:16 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/25/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 10/9/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/19/2024, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 12/16/2024, Defendants' ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/13/2025, Discovery due by 3/4/2025, Motions due by 3/18/2025, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/12/2025, Mediation Due by 4/1/2025, case to be called during June 2025 term of court. Signed by Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on 9/05/2024. (apsn) . Modified on 9/5/2024 to replace with correct document(apsn) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Sur Reply Brief
Thu 09/05 1:13 PM
SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Anthony Prewitt, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (LaFave, Mary) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 09/04 2:55 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Myra Sapp. (Marshall, David) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 08/26 8:33 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Anthony Prewitt, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/3/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(LaFave, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Anthony Prewitt, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Emails | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Remand
Mon 08/12 3:47 PM
MOTION to Remand by Myra Sapp. Response to Motion due by 8/26/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Marshall, David) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal
Fri 07/12 4:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Anthony Prewitt. (ahil) |
|
5 | 5
respoth
Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal
Fri 07/12 4:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (ahil) |
|
4 | 4
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 07/12 4:16 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Anthony Prewitt.(ahil) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 07/12 4:15 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(ahil) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/12 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orangeburg Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024-CP-38-721. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11872486), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(ahil) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Documents |