Winger v. AT&T Inc
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ada Brown |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01797 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 5:11 AM CDT |
Defendant
AT&T Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dina Winger
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/12/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/15 10:35 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lori G. Feldman. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 8/15/2024) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/14 4:16 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14840618) filed by Dina Winger (Feldman, Lori) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Wed 08/14 11:08 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: It has come to the Court's attention that Plaintiff's Counsel Lori Feldman is not admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Therefore, within 20 days from the date of this order, counsel for Plaintiff must either become admitted to practice in this District (See LR 83.7), or move the Court to be admitted Pro Hac Vice (See LR 83.9(b)). Failure to do so may result in sanctions being imposed for failure to comply with an order of the Court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 8/14/2024) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 08/07 10:25 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. AT&T Inc answer due 10/7/2024. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 8/7/2024) (chmb) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 08/06 1:30 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by AT&T Inc (Baggett, Tamara) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/01 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Related Case Debbie Hale and Nick Margeas, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated v. AT&T Inc, Civil Action No. 3:24-cv-01943 (N.D. Tex.) filed by Dina Winger (Yarborough, Patrick) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/01 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Related Case Tina Powell, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated v. AT&T Inc, Civil Action No. 3:24-cv-01948-E (N.D. Tex.) filed by Dina Winger (Yarborough, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/30 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Related Case William Kirby, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated v. Snowflake, Inc. and AT&T Inc., Civil Action No. 3:24-cv-01934 (N.D. Tex.) filed by Dina Winger (Yarborough, Patrick) |
|
Saturday, July 27, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Sat 07/27 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Related Case Jonathan Weaver and Jennifer Carter, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated v. Snowflake, Inc. and AT&T Inc, Civil Action No. 3:24-cv-01915 (N.D. Tex.) filed by Dina Winger (Yarborough, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/24 12:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AT&T Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Cleveland, C) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 07/24 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C Shawn Cleveland for Tamara D. Baggett on behalf of AT&T Inc. (Cleveland, C) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 07/24 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C Shawn Cleveland on behalf of AT&T Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Cleveland, C) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned
Tue 07/16 5:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dina Winger ; served on 7/16/2024. (Yarborough, Patrick) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 07/16 1:29 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ada Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Brantley Starr no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 7/16/2024) (chmb) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Court Request For Recusal
Tue 07/16 12:40 PM
Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford assigned for matters that may be referred in this case. (mms) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 3:44 PM
Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc. (kcr) |
|
5 | 5
qcref
Starr
Mon 07/15 1:36 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (twd) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges (Public Entry)
Mon 07/15 1:31 PM
Judge Brantley Starr added. Senior Judge A. Joe Fish no longer assigned to case. (Possible class action case.) (twd) |
||
Sunday, July 14, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Sun 07/14 1:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dina Winger. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Yarborough, Patrick) |
|
Saturday, July 13, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Sat 07/13 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Yarborough for Jeffrey Lucas Ott on behalf of Dina Winger. (Yarborough, Patrick) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Fri 07/12 8:53 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Dina Winger. (Yarborough, Patrick) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 7:52 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Plaintiffs filed by Dina Winger. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14759888) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Yarborough, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |