Canning v. CMFG Life Insurance Company et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Cecilia M Romero |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00494 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 3:31 AM MDT |
Defendant
Athene Annuity & Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CMFG Life Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant
Protective Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carole Canning
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 07/29 9:52 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Carole Canning (King, Brian) |
|
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 07/29 9:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Carole Canning (King, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
5
pgs
order
Order to Propose Schedule
Tue 07/16 9:49 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/16/2024. (haa) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/15 8:41 AM
Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00494-CMR. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Atty)
Fri 07/12 8:24 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5123665) filed by Carole Canning. (King, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |