Caraffa #350727 v. Arizona, State of et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Michael T Liburdi |
Referred: | Eileen S Willett |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01690 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Clerks Judgment
Fri 07/19 9:22 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed July 19, 2024, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. (KLG) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/19 9:20 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Admit Exhibits of Evidence2 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Complaint1 and this action are dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). If Plaintiff wishes to reassert these claims in the future, Plaintiff must pay the filing and administrative fees in full when filing the new action. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close this case. The docket shall reflect that the Court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), has considered whether an appeal of this decision would be taken in good faith and certifies that an appeal would not be taken in good faith for the reasons stated in the Order and because there is no arguable factual or legal basis for an appeal. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 7/18/2024. (KLG) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing
Fri 07/12 9:36 AM
NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (KLG) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment
Fri 07/12 9:35 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (KLG) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
2 | 2
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/12 9:33 AM
MOTION to Admit Exhibits of Evidence by Alfred Erika Caraffa. (5 Pages) (KLG) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 9:31 AM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Alfred Erika Caraffa. (14 Pages)(KLG) |