Soto v. Cardenas Markets, LLC
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Brenda Weksler |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01268 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 3:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
Cardenas Markets, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adriana Soto
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Wed 08/14 2:37 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DLS) |
|
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Wed 08/14 2:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting12 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/10/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 2/10/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/11/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/14/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Tue 08/13 12:50 PM
Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Pattillo, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/07 4:58 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Pattillo, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Reply
Mon 08/05 7:56 PM
REPLY to Response to3 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Adriana Soto.(Anderson, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response
Mon 07/29 4:20 PM
RESPONSE to3 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. Replies due by 8/5/2024. (Lowry, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Wed 07/17 12:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/17/2024. The parties' proposed discovery plan and scheduling order is due by 8/13/2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BCI) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Tue 07/16 9:55 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Lowry, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
minord
Minute Order Removal Case
Tue 07/16 8:09 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/16/2024. By Deputy Clerk: A. Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/31/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/15/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) |
|
order
Standing Order
Tue 07/16 8:37 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 07/15 6:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Adriana Soto. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Anderson, Jared) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Motion Remand to State Court
Mon 07/15 6:08 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court re1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Adriana Soto. Responses due by 7/29/2024.(Anderson, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 07/15 1:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cardenas Markets, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Cardenas Markets, Inc., Corporate Parent NMFP Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Train Investment Trust for Cardenas Markets, LLC added. (Lowry, Michael) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 07/16 8:02 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (AMMi) |
||
Sunday, July 14, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
3
pgs
cmp
Petition Removal
Sun 07/14 5:24 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-24-891858-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7744707) by Cardenas Markets, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/24/2024. (Lowry, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Answer, | ||
Att: 4 Defendant's Jury Demand, | ||
Att: 5 Arb Petition |