Sinha v. United States Department of Homeland Security
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Alex G Tse |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04227 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 2:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
|
|
Plaintiff
Swapna Sandesh Sinha
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 08/12 7:36 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Swapna Sandesh Sinha.. (Wasden, Jonathan) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 08/12 7:34 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Swapna Sandesh Sinha. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 7/31/2024, answer due 9/30/2024.(Wasden, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A USAO Certified Mail Electronic Return Receipt, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B US DHS Certified Mail Electronic Return Receipt, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C USAG Certified Mail Electronic Return Receipt | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 3:00 PM
Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
order
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order
Fri 07/26 2:54 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 9:50 AM
ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 4 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 07/15 3:55 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/15 6:48 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19615274.) filed by Swapna Sandesh Sinha.(Wasden, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 07/15 6:44 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Swapna Sandesh Sinha (Khedekar, Sameer) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 07/15 6:42 AM
Proposed Summons. (Khedekar, Sameer) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 6:39 AM
COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19615262.). Filed by Swapna Sandesh Sinha.(Khedekar, Sameer) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |