Sickey Global Strategies, LLC v. General Motors, LLC
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Brian A Jackson |
Referred: | Richard L Bourgeois, Jr |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00572 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 5:06 AM CDT |
Defendant
General Motors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sickey Global Strategies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/08 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors, LLC.. (Crochet, Quincy) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Interested Persons
Thu 08/08 11:03 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by General Motors, LLC identifying Affiliate/Interested Person BlackRock, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person General Motors Company, Affiliate/Interested Person General Motors Holdings LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person General Motors LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Sickey Global Strategies, LLC for General Motors, LLC.. (Crochet, Quincy) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/08 10:57 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors, LLC.(Crochet, Quincy) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
90 Day Conference Order
Wed 07/31 12:43 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 10/17/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 10/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/30/2024. (SGO) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/19 9:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sickey Global Strategies, LLC. General Motors, LLC served on 7/18/2024, answer due 8/8/2024. (Duck, Kevin) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 3:54 PM
Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Persons
Mon 07/15 9:29 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Sickey Global Strategies, LLC. (Duck, Kevin) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Complete Case Opening First)
Mon 07/15 9:29 AM
COMPLAINT against General Motors, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAMDC-2776392.), filed by Sickey Global Strategies, LLC.(Duck, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Summons |