Bull, Jr. v. Social Security Administration
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Referred: | James Boone Baxter |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00100 |
Nature of Suit | 865 Social Security - RSI (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:206 Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 07/17 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Dale Poole on behalf of Social Security Administration (Poole, Eric) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 07/17 3:21 PM
ORDER granting2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Scotty Bull, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter on 7/17/2024. (slo) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/15 11:06 AM
REFERRAL ORDER RG 72-3 REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/15/2024. (slo) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/15 10:09 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Scotty Bull, Jr..(Giles, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 10:01 AM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Complaint NEF sent to SSA OGC and to EDTX USAO.), filed by Scotty Bull, Jr..(Giles, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/15 11:04 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (slo) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability
Mon 07/15 11:06 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (slo) |