Lin v. Garland et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Natasha C Merle |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-04886 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 6:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro N. Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patricia Menges
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shuangjie Lin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 08/15 10:59 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (AG) |
||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/14 5:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Patricia Menges (Cooper, David) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases
Fri 07/19 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Allen Cooper on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Cooper, David) |
|
order
Order to Show Cause (Federal)
Fri 07/19 9:58 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and Electronic Service upon the US Attorneys Office re1 Complaint -- Upon the complaint for writ of mandamus filed July 15, 2024, it is ORDERED that: (1) The United States Attorney, as attorney for defendants, is directed to show cause on or before September 17, 2024, in writing, why a writ of mandamus should not be issued, and shall serve a copy of the response on plaintiff, with proof of such service to the Clerk of this Court; (2) On or before October 17, 2024, plaintiff shall file their reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of this Court; (3) Service of a copy of this Order, together with a copy of the complaint, shall be made by the Clerk of this Court via electronic case filing to the United States Attorney. Ordered by Judge Natasha C. Merle on 7/19/2024. (NV) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 07/17 11:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shuangjie Lin. Merrick B. Garland served on 7/16/2024, answer due 9/16/2024; Alejandro N. Mayorkas served on 7/16/2024, answer due 9/16/2024; Patricia Menges served on 7/16/2024, answer due 9/16/2024. (Li, Ling) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 07/15 3:10 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 3:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Patricia Menges. (SDM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 1:33 PM
COMPLAINT Shuangjie Lin against Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Patricia Menges filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18069355 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Shuangjie Lin. (Li, Ling) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |