Harlan Electric Company, Inc. v. Hensel Phelps Construction Co. et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Eli J Richardson |
Referred: | Barbara D Holmes |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00853 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 5:16 AM CDT |
Defendant
Hensel Phelps Construction Co.
|
|
Defendant
Travelers Casualty and Surety Co.
|
|
Plaintiff
Harlan Electric Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/30 3:01 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Harlan Electric Company, Inc.. Hensel Phelps Construction Co. served on 7/24/2024. (Hagler, Jared) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/29 11:24 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Harlan Electric Company, Inc.. Travelers Casualty and Surety Co. served on 7/19/2024. (Hagler, Jared) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Deficiency Notice
Mon 07/22 8:12 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : The option selected on the Business Entity Disclosure Statement requires additional information to be attached;however, this additional information was not included. Counsel shall re-file the document with the additional information using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (ad) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/15 2:02 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Harlan Electric Company, Inc.. (Burkhalter, Stuart) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 11:49 AM
Summons issued as to Hensel Phelps Construction Co., Travelers Casualty and Surety Co. (kc) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Mon 07/15 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 10/22/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Mon 07/15 11:38 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Mon 07/15 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Mon 07/15 11:38 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/15 11:37 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Harlan Electric Company, Inc. (kc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 11:35 AM
COMPLAINT against Hensel Phelps Construction Co., Travelers Casualty and Surety Co. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4119472), filed by Harlan Electric Company, Inc.(kc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Hensel Phelps Airport Low Voltage Conduit Contract, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B MNAA Prime Bond, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Mon 07/15 11:40 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Stuart A. Burkhalter, Jared Alan Hagler admitted to this court . (kc) |