Petty v. Macy's Inc.
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Cristal C Brisco |
Referred: | Scott J Frankel |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00569 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2024 |
Case in other court: | St. Joseph Superior Court, 71D06-2406-CT-000315 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 6:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Macy's, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Petty
129 Napoleon
South Bend, IN 46617 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Remanding Case to State Court ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 08/30 3:49 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 MOTION to Remand Case to St. Joseph Superior Court filed by Macy's, Inc. This matter is remanded to the St. Joseph Superior Court under Case No 71D06-2406-CT-315. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Cristal C Brisco on 8/30/2024. (certified copy of order and docket sheet sent to Clerk, St. Joseph Superior Court)(lns) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 08/14 2:06 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ksc) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Remand
Mon 08/12 1:31 PM
MOTION to Remand Case to St. Joseph Superior Court by Defendant Macy's, Inc.. (Haire, Katherine) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 08/07 11:34 AM
ORDER: Dft is ORDERED to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement instanter, or by 8/14/2024. Failure to timely file a statement as ordered may result in this case being remanded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/6/2024. (mrm) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 07/18 4:36 PM
ORDER, Defendant is ORDERED to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement that properly alleges its citizenship of by July 26, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/17/2024. (rs) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 07/16 11:24 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Cristal C Brisco and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (nhc) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 07/15 1:51 PM
NOTICE by Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC (Haire, Katherine) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/15 1:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC. (Haire, Katherine) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/15 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M Haire on behalf of Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC (Haire, Katherine) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/15 1:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5626244.) from St. Joseph Superior Court, Cause No. 71D06-2406-CT-000315, filed by Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC.(Haire, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh 1 - State Court Records, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Operative Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh 3 - Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/16 11:36 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Macy's, Inc. Answer filed in the St. Joseph Superior Court 6, Case no. 71D06-2406-CT-000315. (nhc) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
State Court Complaint
Tue 07/16 11:29 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Macy's, Inc., filed by Cynthia Petty. Complaint filed in the St. Joseph Circuit/Superior Court, Case no. 71D06-2406-CT-000315. (nhc) |