Cain v. Bonn
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J White |
Referred: | Anthony P Patti |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11811 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Fri 08/23 12:18 PM
Letter re Order of Reassignment from Brandon Lewis Cain (JHea) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
order
Text-Only Reassignment
Mon 08/12 2:51 PM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Matthew F. Leitman to District Judge Robert J. White pursuant to Administrative Order 24-AO-020. (SSch) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Requiring Responsive Pleading*
Fri 08/02 3:46 PM
ORDER Requiring Response to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Michigan Attorney General and the Michigan Department of Corrections. Response due by 1/3/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm) |
|
Att: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Fri 08/02 3:43 PM
ORDER granting5 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs,6 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
petition
Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Wed 07/31 11:25 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Brandon Lewis Cain. (TTho) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
petition
Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Wed 07/31 11:55 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Brandon Lewis Cain. (TTho) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Correct Deficiency - Habeas and 1983 Complaints Only
Tue 07/16 8:38 AM
ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee and/or application to proceed in forma pauperis. Correction due by 8/6/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JHea) |
|
3 | 3
order
Amending Case Caption
Tue 07/16 8:36 AM
Order Amending Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JHea) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
Tue 07/16 8:26 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (SHic) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 07/15 1:34 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Brandon Lewis Cain against Dale Bonns. (JHea) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |