Mahr et al v. Flowerfield Township Planning Commission et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Hala Y Jarbou |
Referred: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00722 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | St. Joseph County Circuit Court, 24-00308-AV |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 6:07 AM EDT |
defendant
Flowerfield Township Planning Commission
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Flowerfield Township Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Craig Mahr
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Lara Mahr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
adr
Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received
Fri 09/06 12:58 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 4692 as to defendants Flowerfield Township Board of Trustees, Flowerfield Township Planning Commission (jmw) |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
adr
Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator
Thu 08/29 1:47 PM
NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Lee T. Silver; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 9/5/2024 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 9/5/2024 (kmd) |
|
10 | 10
adr
Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Selection of Facilitative Mediator
Thu 08/29 1:02 PM
SELECTION of Lee T. Silver as facilitative mediator by defendants Flowerfield Township Board of Trustees, Flowerfield Township Planning Commission (Noland, Craig) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Case Management Order
Tue 08/20 4:43 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 2/20/2025; dispositive motions due by 3/20/2025; settlement conference set for 9/29/2025 at 1:30 PM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 11/4/2025 at 10:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; bench trial set for 12/1/2025 at 8:30 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Joint Status Report (Rule 16)
Mon 08/19 4:45 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Lachman, Sara) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/12 9:42 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to complaint3 with Amended Affirmative Defenses filed by defendants Flowerfield Township Board of Trustees, Flowerfield Township Planning Commission (Noland, Craig) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/29 11:24 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Flowerfield Township Planning Commission served on 7/25/2024, answer due 8/15/2024 (Lachman, Sara) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order Regarding Preparation of Joint Status Report
Mon 07/22 10:06 AM
ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: status report due by 8/19/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
4 | 4
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 07/22 9:35 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Flowerfield Township Board of Trustees, Flowerfield Township Planning Commission re Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal)3 (Noland, Craig) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal)
Mon 07/22 9:34 AM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by Flowerfield Township Board of Trustees, Flowerfield Township Planning Commission (Noland, Craig) |
|
notice
Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/22 9:28 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bogomir Rajsic, III on behalf of defendants Flowerfield Township Board of Trustees, Flowerfield Township Planning Commission (Rajsic, Bogomir) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/22 9:29 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Tracey DeVries on behalf of defendants Flowerfield Township Board of Trustees, Flowerfield Township Planning Commission (DeVries, Tracey) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Tue 07/16 11:29 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou (eod) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/15 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Joseph Circuit Court case number 24-308-AV filed by Flowerfield Township Board of Trustess, Flowerfield Township Planning Commission (Noland, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment A, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Document(s) Attachment B-Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Document(s) Attachment C-Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 4 State Court Document(s) Attachment D-Register of Actions | ||
misc
Receipt
Mon 07/15 3:31 PM
RECEIPT: in the amount of $405.00, receipt number AMIWDC-7427121; filing fee paid by attorney Craig R. Noland on behalf of filer (jmw) |