Drane et al v. Streck
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Newman |
Referred: | Caroline H Gentry |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00202 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Petitioner
Janitra Brown
|
|
Petitioner
Olakwesu Y Elbey
|
|
Petitioner
Patrina Drane
|
|
Respondent
Rob Streck
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 08/29 3:24 PM
Supplimented Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for a Non-Capital Offense Reason Ineffectiveness Assistance of Counsel with Indictment of Confinement, filed by Olakwesu Y Elbey. (kh) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/29 2:57 PM
DEFICIENCY ORDER - Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to return the petition (Doc.1 ) to petitioner, Booking Number 24-006269, at the Montgomery County Jail. Should petitioner wish to proceed with this case, petitioner is ORDERED to sign the petition and return it to the Clerk of Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Petitioner is further ORDERED to file in this Court a written response providing, to the best of her knowledge, the status of her charges and the court in which any proceedings have occurred. Petitioner is advised that failure to respond to this Order within the requisite 30-day period may result in the case being dismissed for lack of prosecution. Should petitioner need additional time to respond, petitioner should file a motion for extension of time. IT IS SO ORDERED Deficiency Deadline by 8/28/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 7/29/2024. (srb)(This document along with petition1 has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 07/15 2:46 PM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 100004213 (kh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 07/15 2:45 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus For a Non-Capital Offense Reason Ineffectivness Assistance of Counsel, filed by Olakwesu Y Elbey. (kh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Filing Fee Receipt |