Russo v. Sodexo, Inc.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Melissa Damian |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-61236 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 6:02 AM EDT |
Defendant
Sodexo, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria E. Russo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/28 10:43 AM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sodexo, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sodexo, S.A., Other Affiliate SDH Services West, LLC for Sodexo, Inc. (Hawran, Gregory) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Wed 08/28 8:38 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 6:55 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sodexo, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sodexo, S.A. for Sodexo, Inc. (Hawran, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Thu 08/22 11:39 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Sodexo, Inc.(Hawran, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 08/19 3:42 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike and in the alternative motion for more definite statement filed by Sodexo, Inc.. Replies due by 8/26/2024. (Hawran, Gregory) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Status Report
Mon 08/19 3:40 PM
STATUS REPORT Defendant's Removal Status Report by Sodexo, Inc. (Hawran, Gregory) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Status Report Order
Fri 08/09 8:39 AM
ORDER ON COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES: Removal Status Report due by 8/19/2024. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 8/9/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Strike
Thu 08/08 10:48 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike and in the alternative motion for more definite statement by Maria E. Russo. Responses due by 8/22/2024. (Corredor, Maria) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Wed 08/07 11:07 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES: Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/27/2024. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 8/7/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
answer
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Mon 07/22 1:19 PM
DEFENDANT'S ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Sodexo, Inc.. (Hawran, Gregory) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 07/15 2:40 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Mon 07/15 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - State Court Complaint) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17678054, filed by Sodexo, Inc..(Hawran, Gregory)No Answer / Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 7/15/2024 (ar24) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, State Court Complaint | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C |