WINGFIELD v. ANDREWS et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Tilman E Self, III |
Referred: | Charles H Weigle |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00234 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 08/06 11:59 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is Ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $ 4.83. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 8/6/2024 (elp) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/30 9:42 AM
Memorandum of Law by TIMOTHY BERNARD(elp) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/15 2:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by TIMOTHY BERNARD.. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(elp) |
|
Att: 1 Trust Account Statement | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/15 2:56 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (elp) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Complaint
Mon 07/15 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by TIMOTHY BERNARD(elp) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |