Koepsel et al v. Consulting Radiologists, Ltd.,
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Eric C Tostrud |
Referred: | Dulce J Foster |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02708 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 5:05 AM CDT |
Defendant
Consulting Radiologists, Ltd.
|
|
Plaintiff
Beckie Birkholz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Koepsel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/29 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Beckie Birkholz, Pamela Koepsel (Malmstrom, Carl) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 07/25 12:48 PM
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud and Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-2708 ECT/DJF . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 7/24/2024. (ACH) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney
Mon 07/15 3:31 PM
(Text-Only) Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing M. Anderson Berry as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (MKB) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 3:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Consulting Radiologists, Ltd. (MKB) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Mon 07/15 3:27 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24-cv-2708 (PJS/LIB). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT (Class Action) against Consulting Radiologists, Ltd., (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11192165) filed by Pamela Koepsel, Beckie Birkholz. Filer requests summons issued. (Malmstrom, Carl) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |