Wilcher v. Pike County Jail et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David C Bramlette, III |
Referred: | Bradley W Rath |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00068 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert. (PSP3)
Thu 08/08 11:00 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to6 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Tracy Vondrake Wilcher.(PG) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Order Opsp2
Tue 07/30 10:59 AM
ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 8/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 7/30/2024 (CRT) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed IFP 1983
Mon 07/29 1:06 PM
*RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis re 3 Order by Tracy Vondrake Wilcher.(PG) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/16 10:15 AM
ORDER SEVERING HABEAS CLAIMS. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Wilchers habeas claims are SEVERED from his claims under § 1983. The 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claims for damages will remain in this civil action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 7/16/2024 (PG) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
5
pgs
order
Order Opsp8
Mon 07/15 3:11 PM
ORDER: on or before 8/14/2024, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 7/15/2024 (CRT) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed IFP 1983
Mon 07/15 2:01 PM
*RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tracy Vondrake Wilcher.(PG) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 1:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Unknown Conerly, Peter J. Griffin, Pike County Jail, filed by Tracy Vondrake Wilcher.(PG) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Assignment, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |