VENTO v. DOGAN et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John F Murphy |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03064 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, 240302293 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 6:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
AVIS RENT A CAR
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DEHA DOGAN
|
|
Plaintiff
ANTHONY VENTO
|
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
DEHA DOGAN
1452 POPLAR STREET
PITTSBURG, PA 15220 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/21 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA A. COLLIVER on behalf of ANTHONY VENTO with Certificate of Service(COLLIVER, JESSICA) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 08/13 3:55 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by AVIS RENT A CAR.(BAYER, JUSTIN) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 08/05 9:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) with Cert of Service filed by ANTHONY VENTO.(SHERRY, DANIEL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A-C: Complaint, Police Report, Avis Webpage | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Fri 07/26 12:26 PM
Letter dated July 26, 2024 by ANTHONY VENTO. (SHERRY, DANIEL) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 07/23 10:08 AM
ORDER PLAINTIFF SHALL, NO LATER THAN JULY 26, 2024, FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE DOCKET ON DEFENDANT DEHA DOGAN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN F MURPHY ON 7/23/24. 7/23/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/22 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL JOSEPH SHERRY, JR on behalf of ANTHONY VENTO with Cert of Service(SHERRY, DANIEL) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Praecipe/Request
Mon 07/22 11:22 AM
Praecipe to Attach Certification of Conference by AVIS RENT A CAR. (BAYER, JUSTIN) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Mon 07/22 10:40 AM
MOTION to Dismiss under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by AVIS RENT A CAR.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(BAYER, JUSTIN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
State Court Record - Attachment
Tue 07/16 2:27 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, ) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
discov
Disclosure
Mon 07/15 2:42 PM
Disclosure by AVIS RENT A CAR, AVIS RENT A CAR D/B/A PUI HOLDINGS, CORP..(BAYER, JUSTIN) |
|
4 | 4
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Mon 07/15 2:41 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AVIS RENT A CAR D/B/A PUI HOLDINGS, CORP..(BAYER, JUSTIN) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Mon 07/15 2:40 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AVIS RENT A CAR.(BAYER, JUSTIN) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/15 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN A. BAYER on behalf of AVIS RENT A CAR, AVIS RENT A CAR D/B/A PUI HOLDINGS, CORP. (BAYER, JUSTIN) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Attorney)
Mon 07/15 2:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AVIS RENT A CAR D/B/A PUI HOLDINGS, CORP., AVIS RENT A CAR (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17600651), filed by AVIS RENT A CAR D/B/A PUI HOLDINGS, CORP., AVIS RENT A CAR.(BAYER, JUSTIN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 4 Case Management Track Form, | ||
Att: 5 Cert of Filing with State Court, | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service |