S.F.V. v. United States of America et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04233 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 3:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Defendant
Estate of Nicholas T. Ramos
|
|
Plaintiff
S.F.V.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 08/14 9:17 PM
Summons Issued as to Estate of Nicholas T. Ramos, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 08/13 10:21 AM
Proposed Summons. (Janssen, Kara) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/19 10:23 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 07/19/2024.(kxo, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order Relating Case
Thu 07/18 11:24 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER. 24-cv-4233-KAW is related to 22-cv-5137-YGR. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/18/2024. (eac, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases
Tue 07/16 10:28 AM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re: 4:22-cv-05137-YGR, Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/16/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/16 7:26 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jaehyun Oh. (wft, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/15 4:06 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19619081.) filed by S.F.V..(Oh, Jaehyun) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 07/15 4:03 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 07/15 2:16 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Ex Parte Application
Mon 07/15 1:14 PM
Ex Parte Application to Proceed Anonymously filed by S.F.V..(Janssen, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Kara J. Janssen, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
52
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 12:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Nicholas T. Ramos, United States of America ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19617405.). Filed by S.F.V.(Janssen, Kara) Modified on 7/15/2024 (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |