Smith v. Skinner
Iowa Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00239 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Appoint Counsel
Thu 08/29 12:06 PM
ORDER to Amend. Order denying2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. See order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 8/29/2024. Copy of order mailed by chambers to petitioner. (h) |
|
Att: 1 AO 241 | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 07/15 2:17 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Brent Marlon Smith. Responses due by 7/29/2024. (btg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 07/15 2:15 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Brent Marlon Smith. (btg) |
|
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 07/15 2:20 PM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 27403 for Filing Fee (btg) |