McCluskey v. Wilberforce University
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Walter H Rice |
Referred: | Peter B Silvain, Jr |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00203 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Greene County Court of Common Pleas Court, 2024CV0467 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 6:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Wilberforce University
1055 N. Bickett Road
Wilberforce, OH 45384 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. James McCluskey
279 Winding Trail
Xenia, OH 45385 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dayton Preliminary Pretrial Order
Tue 08/27 4:29 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 9/13/2024. Settlement Demand due by 9/15/2024. Response to Settlement Demand due by 10/15/2024. Notification re: Contingent Consent/Non-Consent to MJ for Trial Purposes Only due by 9/10/2024. Motions directed to pleadings due by 9/30/2024. Motions to Amend and/or Add Parties due by 9/30/2024. Lay Witness due by 12/31/2024. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 2/1/2025. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 2/21/2025. Defendant Primary Expert due by 2/1/2025. Defendant Rebuttal Expert due by 2/21/2025. Request for Admissions due by 2/7/2025. Discovery due by 3/10/2025. Status Conference set for 3/11/2025 05:00 PM in Teleconference before Judge Walter H. Rice. Summary Judgment Motions Deadline by 4/4/2025. Motions due by 7/8/2025. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 7/15/2025. Exhibit List due by 7/18/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2025 05:00 PM in Teleconference before Judge Walter H. Rice. Jury Instructions Submission due by 7/24/2025. Transcripts (Counter Designations of Testimony) due by 7/30/2025. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Dayton before Judge Walter H. Rice. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 8/27/2024. (acw) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 08/13 4:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held: Telephone Conference held on 8/13/2024. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2025 at 5:00 p.m. by Teleconference before Judge Walter H. Rice. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2025 beginning at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 - Dayton before Judge Walter H. Rice.) Scheduling Order to issue. (bjr) |
||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Mon 08/12 2:49 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Wilberforce University. (Stokely, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw
Tue 08/06 9:21 AM
ENTRY GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS CO-COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT WILBERFORCE UNIVERSITY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 8/6/2024. (srb) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Withdraw
Mon 08/05 10:46 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Co-Counsel by Defendant Wilberforce University. |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Entry | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/01 11:04 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint filed by Wilberforce University. (Stokely, Matthew) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Fri 07/19 1:12 PM
STIPULATION Agreed Entry for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Answer by Defendant Wilberforce University. (Stokely, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/16 9:11 AM
NOTICE by Defendant Wilberforce University re1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 8:49 AM
Copy of COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Wilberforce University, filed by James McCluskey. (acw) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/15 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greene County Common Pleas Court, case number 2024CV0467 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10066527), filed by Wilberforce University. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |