Favors v. Lanin et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Jerry W Blackwell |
Referred: | Leo I Brisbois |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02709 |
Nature of Suit | 560 Prisoner Petitions - Civil Detainee - Conditions of Confinement |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter from Clerk's Office re: In Forma Pauperis (IFP)
Thu 08/29 11:13 AM
LETTER from Clerk's Office to Joseph Anthony Favors re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Joseph Anthony Favors. (kt) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 08/27 2:34 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Joseph Anthony Favors Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/27/2024.(JLB) |
|
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order on Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Tue 08/27 2:28 PM
ORDER denying as moot2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; granting7 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/27/2024. (JLB) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/09 2:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Anthony Favors re11 Exhibit,10 Proposed Order to Judge,9 Exhibit,8 MEMORANDUM. (kt) |
|
11 | 11
respm
Exhibit (Motions and Related Filings)
Fri 08/09 2:12 PM
EXHIBIT re7 Amended Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph Anthony Favors filed by Joseph Anthony Favors.(kt) |
|
10 | 10
respm
Proposed Order to Judge re Motion
Fri 08/09 2:07 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re8 MEMORANDUM SUPPORTING MOTION FOR ACCELORATED THRO AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Joseph Anthony Favors.(kt) |
|
9 | 9
respm
Exhibit (Motions and Related Filings)
Fri 08/09 2:05 PM
LR 7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERITIFICATE re8 MEMORANDUM SUPPORTING MOTION FOR ACCELORATED THRO AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Joseph Anthony Favors.(kt) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Fri 08/09 2:04 PM
MEMORANDUM SUPPORTING MOTION FOR ACCELORATED THRO AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (kt) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP)
Fri 08/09 2:03 PM
AMENDED Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph Anthony Favors.(kt) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order/Notice to Attorney
Fri 08/02 11:14 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 636(b)(1)(A), (B), and (C), all dispositive and non-dispositive motions are referred to the Magistrate Judge. Ordered by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 8/2/2024. (DMD) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Sealed Exhibit (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings)
Tue 07/23 1:04 PM
SEALED EXHIBIT-Bank Statement re4 Letter,2 IFP by Joseph Anthony Favors. (MMG) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Tue 07/23 1:02 PM
LETTER to the Court re:2 IFP from Joseph Anthony Favors.(MMG) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
PPro_se
Exhibit
Mon 07/15 3:50 PM
EXHIBIT re2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph Anthony Favors filed by Joseph Anthony Favors.(jam) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP)
Mon 07/15 3:50 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (jam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Jodi Hardstead, Nancy Johnston, Mike Lanin filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (jam) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |