Perkins v. 21st Mortgage Corporation et al
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | J Daniel Breen |
Referred: | Jon A York |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02497 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 42:1981 Housing Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 5:23 AM CDT |
Defendant
21st Mortgage Corporation
C T Corporation 300 Montvue Road
Knoxville, TN 37919 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Phillip L. Robertson
Suite 315 555 Marriott Drive
Nashville, TN 37214 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Udessa A. Perkins
2835 Park Swain Road
Grand Junction, TN 38039 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 16 2024
ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY 9 MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 7/16/24. (mbm) |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for TRO
Tue 07/16 4:24 PM
ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY9 MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 7/16/24. (mbm) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Tue 07/16 2:07 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Udessa A. Perkins. (Jones, Ted) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/16 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip L. Robertson on behalf of All Defendants (Robertson, Philip) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 4:06 PM
Summons Issued as to Phillip L. Robertson. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 4:04 PM
Summons Issued as to 21st Mortgage Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/15 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice LR 16.2
Mon 07/15 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj) |
|
3 | 3
notice
ADR Compliance
Mon 07/15 3:51 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/15 3:49 PM
Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (agj) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 8:05 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4457270), filed by Udessa A. Perkins.(Jones, Ted) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons 21st Century, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Robetson | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Mon 07/15 3:57 PM
Note to all parties: Pursuant to the Transfer of Jurisdiction to the Eastern Division, the case number has been modified. Please take notice of the case number, as the only change in the number will be the divisional code at the beginning of the case number. (Ex. 1: XX-cv-XXXX or 2:XX-cv-XXXX). The old case has been closed and will contain a case flag that it is closed. Particular attention should be used when selecting the case number during CM/ECF filing of future pleadings to ensure that you are filing in the correct (open) case. The new case number is 1:24-cv-2497-JDB-jay. Please list the correct case number on all future pleadings. (agj) |