Harrison v. Presbyterian Healthcare Services, Inc. et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Laura Fashing |
Referred: | John F Robbenhaar |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00724 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Ninth Judicial District Court, D-905-CV-24-00265 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 4:13 AM MDT |
Defendant
Presbyterian Healthcare Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Radiology Associates of Albuquerque PA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Curry
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Enrique Bursztyn
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Peter Durso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
22 | 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Presbyterian Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Behm, Mary) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 5 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (amf) | ||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (amf) | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
19 | 19 1 pgs ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. (kc) | |
18 | 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Daniel Harrison. (Hazen, Bridget) | |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
17 | 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Peter Durso. (Williams, Carla) | |
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
16 | 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Enrique Bursztyn, Radiology Associates of Albuquerque PA. (Barnett, Chance) | |
15 | 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Enrique Bursztyn, Radiology Associates of Albuquerque PA (Barnett, Chance) | |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Curry (Macke, Daniel) | |
13 | 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Presbyterian Healthcare Services, Inc. (Behm, Mary) | |
12 | 12 Presbyterian Healthcare Services ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Presbyterian Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Behm, Mary) | |
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Curry voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Macke, Daniel) | ||
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Peter Durso voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Williams, Carla) | ||
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Enrique Bursztyn, Radiology Associates of Albuquerque PA voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Barnett, Chance) | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Presbyterian Healthcare Services, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Behm, Mary) | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE by Enrique Bursztyn, Radiology Associates of Albuquerque PA Of Consent to Removal (Barnett, Chance) | |
6 | 6 NOTICE by Peter Durso Notice of Consent to Removal (Williams, Carla) | |
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE by The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Curry re1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Macke, Daniel) | |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re1 Notice of Removal, by Presbyterian Healthcare Services, Inc. (Behm, Mary) | |
Att: 1 Supplement | ||
3 | 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re1 Notice of Removal, by Presbyterian Healthcare Services, Inc. (Behm, Mary) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Presbyterian Healthcare Services, Inc. from Ninth Judicial District Curry County, case number D-905-2024-00265. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Presbyterian Healthcare Services, Inc..(Behm, Mary) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9450141 re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Presbyterian Healthcare Services, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Behm, Mary) | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (bc) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) |