Nielson v. Daihen, Inc.
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Ted Stewart |
Referred: | Dustin B Pead |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00496 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 4:17 AM MDT |
Defendant
Daihen, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Nielson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
23
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 08/28 1:35 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Russell Nielson.(Petersen, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Exhistence | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda E. Weinberg on behalf of Russell Nielson (Weinberg, Brenda) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
misc
Received Consent /Reassignment Form
Mon 08/05 2:14 PM
RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiff Russell Nielson. (mh) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Fri 08/02 1:56 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Daihen, Inc.. (Billings, David) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order to Propose Schedule
Thu 08/01 12:55 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/1/24. (haa) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/31 1:12 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/31/24. (gb) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Daihen, Inc., Plaintiff Russell Nielson. (kec) | |
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Mon 07/15 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Defendant Daihen, Inc., Plaintiff Russell Nielson. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 8/5/2024. (kec) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Atty)
Mon 07/15 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 240904968, (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5124655) filed by Daihen, Inc.. (Billings, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Email of Complaint | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/15 4:20 PM
Judge Ted Stewart added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00496-TS. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference
Mon 07/15 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Daihen, Inc., Plaintiff Russell Nielson. (kec) |