Buzz v. Dr. Marks et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Daniel J Albregts |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01274 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 08/01 10:25 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Alexander A. Buzz. (DLS) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/26 8:52 AM
ORDER Denying without prejudice1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ordered that Plaintiff has until August 26, 2024, to either pay the full $405 filing fee or file a new fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three required documents: (1) a completed application with the inmate's two signatures on page 3, (2) a completed financial certificate that is signed both by the inmate and the prison or jail official, and (3) a copy of the inmate's trust fund account statement for the previous six-month period. Plaintiff is cautioned that this action will be subject to dismissal without prejudice if Plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order. A dismissal without prejudice allows Plaintiff to refile the case with the Court, under a new case number, when Plaintiff can file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the required filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff Alexander A. Buzz the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate and instructions for the same and retain the complaint (ECF No. 1 ) but not file it at this time. IFP or payment of filing fees due 8/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/25/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG) ( For Distribution by law library. ) |
|
Att: 1 Information for Filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Tue 07/16 11:41 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. ( For Distribution by law library. ) (RJDG) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 11:36 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Alexander A. Buzz.(RJDG) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint |