Morton v. Breitenbach
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Craig S Denney |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00310 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/19 3:40 PM
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that the initial screening of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No.1 -1) under the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases is deferred until such time as he has fully complied with this order. The Clerk of Court is instructed to send Petitioner a blank form IFP application for incarcerated litigants along with instructions, and a copy of this order. It is further ordered that, within 45 days of the date of this order (9/2/2024) , Petitioner must file an IFP application that includes a: (a) financial certificate signed by Petitioner and an authorized prison official; (b) financial declaration and acknowledgement signed by Petitioner; and (c) copy of Petitioner's inmate account statement for the six-month period prior to filing. Alternatively, Petitioner must pay the $5 filing fee within 45 days of the date of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/19/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Att: 1 IFP form/Instruction, | ||
Att: 2 2nd Copy of Order | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Habeas only - FORM
Mon 07/15 3:46 PM
NOTICE from USDC advising case against Nethanjah Breitenbach, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:24-cv-00310-MMD-CSD . ( For Distribution by law library. ) (GA) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/15 3:45 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Petitioner Joseph Richard Morton.(GA) |
|
Att: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |