Clay #093735 v. Washburn et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Roslyn O Silver |
Referred: | Michael T Morrissey |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01731 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/26 1:16 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Unknown Aplas, Centurion of Arizona, Unknown Evens, Gregory Fizer, NaphCare, Richard Sites, Jason Snow, Ryan Thornell, Russell Washburn, Unknown Evans filed by Wade Nolan Clay. (10 pages) (KJ) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
21
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Fri 08/16 1:50 PM
ORDER: The Complaint (Doc.1 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 8/16/2024. (KJ) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/29 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Filing Fee Paid by Wade Nolan Clay. (2 pages) (EJA) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 07/25 2:32 PM
Filing fee PAID IN FULL. (BAS) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing
Wed 07/17 1:56 PM
NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (EJA) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Mon 07/15 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (EJA) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 4:10 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Wade Nolan Clay. (10 pages) (EJA) |