Noyes v. Raytheon Company
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Rosemary Marquez |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00343 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Pima County Superior Court, C20241783 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 2:54 AM MST |
Defendant
Raytheon Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lauren Noyes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 09/03 10:44 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, a telephonic pretrial scheduling conference is set for 10/11/24, at 9:00 am, before the law clerk to the Honorable Maria S Aguilera. Counsel shall file with the Court, on or before 10/4/24, a joint report. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera on 9/3/24. (BAC) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 09/03 8:35 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's Answer is accepted as timely filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera. (LM) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 08/28 3:08 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation, in accordance with the provisions of 28 USC § 636(b)(1), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and LRCiv. 72.1 and 72.2. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV 24-00343 TUC-RM(MSA). Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 8/27/24. (BAC) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
minute_ord
~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 08/20 2:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge Rosemary Marquez. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 24-00343 TUC-RM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) |
|
10 | 10
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Tue 08/20 2:44 PM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline
Tue 08/06 9:46 AM
Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (ARC) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/05 4:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Raytheon Company.(Manning, Stephanie) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion
Fri 08/02 10:54 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jamie C Pollaci on behalf of Defendant Raytheon Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
utility
Civil Case Opening - Fees
Thu 08/01 12:38 PM
Civil Case Opening Fee Received: $ 405.00 receipt number AAZDC-23310287. (Pollaci, Jamie) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 07/17 2:34 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, this case is reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Maria S Aguilera. Counsel and the parties shall designate all further filings in this case as: CV 24-00343 TUC-MSA. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 7/17/24. (BAC) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/17 12:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Answer to Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Raytheon Company.(Manning, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
misc
Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion
Wed 07/17 8:10 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Stephanie J Manning on behalf of Defendant Raytheon Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 07/15 4:46 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23244834. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott H Rash. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-343-TUC-SHR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/15 4:30 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Raytheon Company. (Manning, Stephanie) (MYE) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/15 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20241783. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23244834 filed by Raytheon Company. (Manning, Stephanie)(MYE) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J | ||
***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint, Complaint, Rule 102A Fastar Certificate upon Raytheon Company on 6/26/2024. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 6/27/2024.) (MYE) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. | ||
service
Service Executed
Mon 07/15 4:44 PM
***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint, Complaint, Rule 102A Fastar Certificate upon Raytheon Company on 6/26/2024. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 6/27/2024.) (MYE) |