Levi Chin et al v. Evergreen Freedom Foundation
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-01473 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 3:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
Evergreen Freedom Foundation
|
|
Plaintiff
Levi Chin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Preciado
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 08/16 4:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Shella Alcabes. (Gutman Dickinson, Julie) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 08/14 2:59 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Response to the Court's July 30, 2024 Order to Show Cause ("OSC") why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, dkt.20 , and Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (FAC), dkt.18 . Based upon Plaintiff's Response and the FAC, it appears the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1332. Hence, the July 30, 2024 OSC, dkt.16 , is hereby DISCHARGED. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rma) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons Issued
Mon 08/12 4:29 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition18 as to Defendant Evergreen Freedom Foundation. (aco) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Response
Fri 08/09 3:33 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciadoto Order to Show Cause,16 (Gutman Dickinson, Julie) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Summons Request
Fri 08/09 3:10 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition18 filed by Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado. (Gutman Dickinson, Julie) |
|
18 | 18
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 08/09 3:08 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Evergreen Freedom Foundation amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado(Gutman Dickinson, Julie) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/31 4:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Shella Alcabes. (Gutman Dickinson, Julie) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 07/30 3:21 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Accordingly, Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs shall file a response to this Order no later than fourteen days from the date of this Order. (See document for further information). (aco) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/30 2:34 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. APPLICATION of Attorney Joey P Leniski, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado, designating Julie Dickinson Gutman as local counsel is GRANTED.; granting11 Non-Resident Attorney Joey P Leniski, Jr. (aco) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Errata
Thu 07/25 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 (Wojciechowski, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 07/23 7:19 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexis M Wood counsel for Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado. Adding Alexis M. Wood as counsel of record for Levi Chin and Teresa Preciado for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Levi Chin and Teresa Preciado. (Attorney Alexis M Wood added to party Levi Chin(pty:pla), Attorney Alexis M Wood added to party Teresa Preciado(pty:pla))(Wood, Alexis) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 07/23 7:15 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kas L Gallucci counsel for Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado. Adding Kas L. Gallucci as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Levi Chin and Teresa Preciado. (Attorney Kas L Gallucci added to party Levi Chin(pty:pla), Attorney Kas L Gallucci added to party Teresa Preciado(pty:pla))(Gallucci, Kas) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 07/22 3:43 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joey P. Leniski, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37876775) filed by Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado. (Gutman Dickinson, Julie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 07/18 4:24 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Tue 07/16 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joey P Keniski, Jr. on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 07/16 3:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Evergreen Freedom Foundation. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 07/16 3:04 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 07/16 3:03 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 07/16 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 07/15 5:33 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado. (Gutman Dickinson, Julie) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 07/15 5:30 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado, (Gutman Dickinson, Julie) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 07/15 5:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado. (Gutman Dickinson, Julie) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 07/15 5:24 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37836299 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Levi Chin, Teresa Preciado. (Attorney Julie Gutman Dickinson added to party Levi Chin(pty:pla), Attorney Julie Gutman Dickinson added to party Teresa Preciado(pty:pla))(Gutman Dickinson, Julie) |