Integrated Components Corporation
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-17064 |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 13, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Sep 23, 2024 |
Debtor
Integrated Components Corporation
2592 W 78th St
Hialeah, FL 33016-2773 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Barry E Mukamal
PO Box 14183
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33302 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 07/16/2024 12:02 AM EDT |
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 07/15 5:26 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-17064 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A44516124. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]
Mon 07/15 5:24 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $338] (Peraza, Manuel) |
|
2 | 2
attydoc
Disclosure of Compensation
Mon 07/15 5:24 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Manuel A Peraza. (Peraza, Manuel) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 07/15 5:25 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Integrated Components Corporation. (Peraza, Manuel) |
|
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset)
Mon 07/15 6:02 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Mukamal, Barry E. Meeting of Creditors to be held by Video Conference on 8/13/2024 at 04:00 PM at www.Zoom.us - Mukamal: Meeting ID 936 830 2594, Passcode 8081192532, Phone (954) 399-2906 Proofs of Claim due by 9/23/2024. (admin) |