Gabrius, Francelet v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jose E Martinez |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-22680 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 5:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami Field Office Director
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Attorney General
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francelet Gabrius
A# 216689 101 Krome Service Processing Center Inmate Mail/Parcels 18201 SW 12th Street
Miami, FL 33194 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee)
Tue 08/06 11:14 AM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 8/2/2024 in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number FLS290405. (jes) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Tue 07/30 7:22 PM
Respondent's Return in Opposition / RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Department of Homeland Security, Miami Field Office Director, U.S. Attorney General. Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Miami Field Office Director(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party U.S. Attorney General(pty:dft).(Diaz, Natalie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 07/16 2:48 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-28 U.S.C. § 2241 re1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Francelet Gabrius. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc) Modified text on 7/16/2024 (pc) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 2:45 PM
ORDER denying3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. On or before 8/15/24, the petitioner shall file a legally sufficient motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting, certified inmate account statement, or pay the Clerks filing fee of $ 5.00. Filing Fee due by 8/15/2024. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/15 11:19 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Francelet Gabrius. (kma) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Mon 07/15 11:17 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez (kma) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 07/15 11:09 AM
APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00 (IFP Motion filed), filed by Francelet Gabrius. Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (kma) |