TAYLOR v. KEMP et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Clay D Land |
Referred: | Amelia G Helmick |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00105 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order Order to Show Cause Order on Motion to Change Venue Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 09/05 2:58 PM
ORDER denying5 Motion to Change Venue. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AMELIA G HELMICK on 9/5/2024. (mlb) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Change Venue Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 08/28 8:50 AM
MOTION to Change Venue and for various reliefs filed by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II. Motion referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Amelia G. Helmick (tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/29 3:08 PM
ORDER to pay filing fee or submit a proper and complete motion to proceed IFP, including a certified copy of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account statement. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to forward Plaintiff a motion to proceed IFP with the appropriate account certification form. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AMELIA G HELMICK on 7-29-24. (jdl) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/15 9:36 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Helmick issued at the direction of the Court (tlf) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/15 9:34 AM
UCC Financial Statement by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II as to1 Complaint (tlf) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 9:33 AM
COMPLAINT filed by CHARLES MYRON TAYLOR II against LETITIA BURKS, DESHAWN JONES, BRIAN P KEMP, TYRONE OLIVER (tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Grievance Appeal Response, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |