JACKSON v.DANFORTH et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Marc T Treadwell |
Referred: | Charles H Weigle |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00230 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Petitioner
RODERICK BO JACKSON
|
|
Respondent
TYRONE OLIVER
|
|
Respondent
WILLIAM DANFORTH
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judgment
Mon 07/22 1:53 PM
JUDGMENT (elp) |
|
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/22 12:06 PM
ORDER DENYING1 Jackson's Notice of Removal of Action under Title 28 U.S.C. § 1446 & Georgia Constitutional Article 6, Sec. 9, Para. 4 and REMANDING this case to the Superior Court of Coffee County. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 7/22/2024. (kat) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/16 8:55 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (elp) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/15 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RODERICK BO JACKSON All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case. ,filed by RODERICK BO JACKSON.(elp) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |